Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 25, 2019