Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2019
Bill April 23, 2019