Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1074 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Watson S.B. No. 1074
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to the authority to enter into a comprehensive development
77 agreement for a project on Interstate Highway 35 in Travis County.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is
1010 transferred to Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
1111 redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended
1212 to read as follows:
1313 Sec. 223.2001. DEFINITION. [(b)] In this subchapter,
1414 "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a
1515 minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction,
1616 rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in
1717 Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the
1818 financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project
1919 described in that section [Subsection (a)].
2020 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
2121 is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows:
2222 Sec. 223.2002. LIMITATION. The department may enter into a
2323 comprehensive development agreement only:
2424 (1) for specific projects authorized under this
2525 subchapter; or
2626 (2) as provided by Subchapter F.
2727 SECTION 3. Sections 223.201(f), (g), and (j),
2828 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
2929 (f) The department may enter into a comprehensive
3030 development agreement [only] for all or part of[:
3131 [(1)] the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project[;
3232 [(2) the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
3333 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
3434 Highway 380;
3535 [(3) the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
3636 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
3737 [(4) the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
3838 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
3939 Highway 35E;
4040 [(5) the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
4141 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
4242 [(A) Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
4343 Interstate Highway 20; and
4444 [(B) U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
4545 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
4646 [(6) the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway
4747 59 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
4848 [(7) the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
4949 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
5050 [(8) the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
5151 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
5252 [(9) the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
5353 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
5454 [(10) the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
5555 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
5656 [(11) the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
5757 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; and
5858 [(12) the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
5959 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
6060 Interstate Highway 37].
6161 (g) The department may combine in a comprehensive
6262 development agreement under this subchapter:
6363 (1) a toll project and a rail facility as defined by
6464 Section 91.001; or
6565 (2) two or more projects for which the department is
6666 authorized under this subchapter to enter into a comprehensive
6767 development agreement [described by Subsection (f)].
6868 (j) Before the department may enter into a comprehensive
6969 development agreement under this subchapter [Subsection (f)], the
7070 department must:
7171 (1) for a project other than the State Highway 99
7272 (Grand Parkway) project, obtain[, not later than August 31, 2017,]
7373 the appropriate environmental clearance:
7474 (A) for the project; or
7575 (B) for the initial or base scope of the project
7676 if the project agreement provides for the phased construction of
7777 the project; and
7878 (2) present to the commission a full financial plan
7979 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals.
8080 SECTION 4. Section 223.2012(a), Transportation Code, is
8181 amended to read as follows:
8282 (a) In this section, the North Tarrant Express project is
8383 the project on Interstate Highway 35W in Tarrant County from
8484 Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114 that was [described by
8585 Section 223.201(f)(3)] entered into on June 23, 2009.
8686 SECTION 5. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
8787 is amended by adding Section 223.2014 to read as follows:
8888 Sec. 223.2014. AUTHORIZED PROJECT. (a) The department may
8989 enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project on
9090 Interstate Highway 35 in Travis County.
9191 (b) Any managed lane included in a project described by
9292 Subsection (a) must provide free use of the lane to a public transit
9393 motor bus of a mass transit entity operating under Subtitle K.
9494 (c) This section expires August 31, 2021.
9595 SECTION 6. The following provisions of the Transportation
9696 Code are repealed:
9797 (1) Sections 223.201(i), (k), and (m); and
9898 (2) Section 223.2011.
9999 SECTION 7. Section 370.305(c), Transportation Code, is
100100 amended to read as follows:
101101 (c) An authority may enter into a comprehensive development
102102 agreement only:
103103 (1) for specific projects authorized under this
104104 subchapter; or
105105 (2) as provided by Subchapter K [Except as provided by
106106 this chapter, an authority's authority to enter into a
107107 comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011].
108108 SECTION 8. Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
109109 is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows:
110110 Sec. 370.3051. AUTHORIZED PROJECTS FOR COMPREHENSIVE
111111 DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. (a) A regional mobility authority may
112112 enter into a comprehensive development agreement for a project on
113113 Interstate Highway 35 in Travis County.
114114 (b) Any managed lane included in a project described by
115115 Subsection (a) must provide free use of the lane to a public transit
116116 motor bus of a mass transit entity operating under Subtitle K.
117117 (c) This section expires August 31, 2021.
118118 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.