Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1082 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1082
1+By: Taylor, et al. S.B. No. 1082
2+ (Deshotel)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the feasibility of creating and maintaining a coastal
68 barrier system.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. (a) The legislature shall establish a joint
911 interim committee to continue to study the feasibility and
1012 desirability of creating and maintaining a coastal barrier system
1113 in this state that includes a series of gates and barriers to
1214 prevent storm surge damage to gulf beaches or coastal ports,
1315 industry, or property.
1416 (b) The committee is composed of:
1517 (1) the members of the standing committee of the
1618 senate that has primary jurisdiction over natural resources;
1719 (2) the members of the standing committee of the house
1820 of representatives that has primary jurisdiction over land and
1921 resource management;
2022 (3) two members of the senate appointed by the
2123 lieutenant governor, each of whom represents a district in a county
2224 that borders the Gulf of Mexico; and
2325 (4) two members of the house of representatives
2426 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives, each of
2527 whom represents a district in a county that borders the Gulf of
2628 Mexico.
2729 (c) The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
2830 representatives shall jointly designate a chair or, alternatively,
2931 designate two co-chairs from among the committee membership.
3032 (d) The committee may adopt rules necessary to carry out the
3133 committee's duties under this section.
3234 (e) Not later than December 1, 2020, the committee shall
3335 report to the governor and the legislature the findings of the study
3436 and any recommendations developed by the committee under this
3537 section.
3638 (f) The committee is abolished and this Act expires January
3739 11, 2021.
3840 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect June 1, 2019, if it
3941 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
4042 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
4143 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for effect on that
4244 date, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
43- ______________________________ ______________________________
44- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
45- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1082 passed the Senate on
46- April 1, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
47- ______________________________
48- Secretary of the Senate
49- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1082 passed the House on
50- May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 8,
51- two present not voting.
52- ______________________________
53- Chief Clerk of the House
54- Approved:
55- ______________________________
56- Date
57- ______________________________
58- Governor