Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1118 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/25/2019

                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1118
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 25, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1;
 April 25, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1118 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to programs operated by the Texas Department of Housing
 and Community Affairs to increase access to safe and affordable
 housing in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter EE to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER EE. AMY YOUNG BARRIER REMOVAL PROGRAM
 Sec. 2306.6801.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Person with a disability" means a person with one
 or more documented physical or mental impairments, or who is
 regarded as having one or more physical or mental impairments, that
 substantially limit the person's ability to perform major life
 activities.
 (2)  "Program" means the Amy Young Barrier Removal
 Program established under this subchapter.
 (3)  "Program administrator" means an entity certified
 by the department to administer services under the program,
 including:
 (A)  a local governmental entity;
 (B)  a council of governments;
 (C)  a nonprofit organization;
 (D)  a local mental health authority; and
 (E)  a public housing authority.
 Sec. 2306.6802.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PROGRAM. (a)  The
 department shall establish the Amy Young Barrier Removal Program to
 provide grants for modifying the home in which a person with a
 disability lives to:
 (1)  increase the accessibility of the home;
 (2)  eliminate life-threatening hazards in the home; or
 (3)  correct unsafe living conditions in the home.
 (b)  A grant awarded under the program may not exceed $20,000
 or another amount adjusted by the department periodically to
 account for cost increases.
 (c)  The department may adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this subchapter.
 Sec. 2306.6803.  ELIGIBILITY. (a)  A grant recipient must:
 (1)  be a tenant, homeowner, or other member of a
 household in which a person with a disability lives; and
 (2)  meet the eligibility requirements of this section.
 (b)  To be eligible for a grant under the program, the income
 of the household for which a grant is sought may not exceed the
 greater of 80 percent of the area median family income or 80 percent
 of the statewide income limits, adjusted for household size, as
 determined annually by the United States Department of Housing and
 Urban Development.
 (c)  The department may adopt other eligibility requirements
 that are considered appropriate by the department.
 Sec. 2306.6804.  PROGRAM ADMINISTRATION. (a)  The
 department may certify a program administrator to:
 (1)  process applications for a grant;
 (2)  verify eligibility of a grant applicant;
 (3)  secure construction contractors to renovate or
 rehabilitate a home under the program; and
 (4)  oversee the renovation or rehabilitation of a home
 under the program.
 (b)  The department by rule shall adopt procedures for the
 certification of a program administrator.
 Sec. 2306.6805.  FUNDING. (a)  The department shall award
 grants under the program using:
 (1)  gifts, grants, or donations solicited by the
 department for purposes of this subchapter; and
 (2)  money in the barrier removal grant fund
 established under Section 2306.6806.
 (b)  In a state fiscal year, the department may use not more
 than 10 percent of the revenue available for purposes of this
 subchapter to increase the ability of program administrators to
 assist the department in implementing the purposes of this chapter
 and to increase the number of entities that are able to implement
 those purposes. The department shall use available revenue under
 this subsection to provide financial assistance, technical
 training, and management support for the purposes of this
 subsection.
 Sec. 2306.6806.  BARRIER REMOVAL GRANT FUND. (a)  The
 department shall establish the barrier removal grant fund in the
 department. Money in the fund may be used only for the purpose of
 awarding grants under the program.
 (b)  Each year, the department shall transfer to the barrier
 removal grant fund the money remaining in the housing trust fund
 established under Section 2306.201 after transferring or
 allocating from that fund money appropriated to the department by
 the legislature for the purposes of this subchapter and money
 specifically allocated under Sections 2306.202(a) and 2306.758(d).
 The amount transferred to the barrier removal grant fund from the
 housing trust fund under this subsection may not exceed $3 million.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2306.753(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  To be eligible for a loan under this subchapter, an
 owner-builder:
 (1)  may not have an annual income that exceeds 80 [60]
 percent, as determined by the department, of the greater of the
 state or local median family income, when combined with the income
 of any person who resides with the owner-builder;
 (2)  must have resided in this state for the preceding
 six months;
 (3)  must have successfully completed an owner-builder
 education class under Section 2306.756; and
 (4)  must agree to:
 (A)  provide through personal labor at least 65
 percent of the labor necessary to build or rehabilitate the
 proposed housing by working through a state-certified
 owner-builder housing program;
 (B)  provide an amount of personal labor
 equivalent to the amount required under Paragraph (A) in connection
 with building or rehabilitating housing for others through a
 state-certified owner-builder housing program;
 (C)  provide through the noncontract labor of
 friends, family, or volunteers and through personal labor at least
 65 percent of the labor necessary to build or rehabilitate the
 proposed housing by working through a state-certified
 owner-builder housing program; or
 (D)  if due to documented disability or other
 limiting circumstances as defined by department rule the
 owner-builder cannot provide the amount of personal labor otherwise
 required by this subdivision, provide through the noncontract labor
 of friends, family, or volunteers at least 65 percent of the labor
 necessary to build or rehabilitate the proposed housing by working
 through a state-certified owner-builder housing program.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2306.758(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  All money received by the department as part of the
 owner-builder loan program under this subchapter, including any
 amount received by the department for payment of the principal of or
 interest on a loan made under this subchapter, shall be deposited in
 the housing trust fund established under Section 2306.201 to be
 used to carry out the purposes of this subchapter. If the money to
 be received by the department for a state fiscal year for payment of
 the principal of or interest on a loan made under this subchapter is
 less than $4 [$3] million for a state fiscal year, the department
 shall use any available source of money in the housing trust fund to
 ensure that not less than $4 [$3] million is used for the
 owner-builder loan program each state fiscal year.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations that are available
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
 shall adopt rules as necessary to implement Subchapter EE, Chapter
 2306, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *