Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1132 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/15/2019

                            By: West S.B. No. 1132
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1, 1 present not voting; April 15, 2019, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to annex an
 enclave.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.0115(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a municipality that:
 (1)  is wholly or partly located in a county in which a
 majority of the population of two or more municipalities, each with
 a population of 225,000 [300,000] or more, are located; and
 (2)  proposes to annex an area that:
 (A)  is wholly surrounded by a municipality and
 within the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction; and
 (B)  has fewer than 100 dwelling units.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *