Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1133 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Bettencourt, et al. S.B. No. 1133
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2019; March 7, 2019,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
4+ April 29, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 29, 2019,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1133 By: Watson
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to prohibiting public schools from owning, leasing, or
714 having a business interest in certain entities and real property
815 associated with those entities.
916 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1017 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 45, Education Code, is
1118 amended by adding Section 45.116 to read as follows:
1219 Sec. 45.116. OWNERSHIP OF OR BUSINESS INTEREST IN CERTAIN
1320 ENTITIES AND PROPERTY PROHIBITED. (a) In this section:
1421 (1) "Affiliate" has the meaning assigned by Section
1522 1.002, Business Organizations Code.
1623 (2) "Business interest" means owning or controlling,
1724 directly or indirectly, more than a 10 percent interest in a
1825 business entity.
1926 (b) This section does not apply if the commissioner
2027 determines that a business interest in an entity or the lease or
2128 ownership of real property, directly or indirectly through an
2229 affiliate, by a school district or open-enrollment charter school
2330 is used primarily for classroom space or serves a public purpose.
2431 (c) A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
2532 not, directly or indirectly through an affiliate, including an
2633 affiliated nonprofit corporation, have a business interest in an
2734 entity or lease or own real property in this state associated with
2835 an entity described by the North American Industry Classification
2936 System (NAICS) in any of the following sector codes:
3037 (1) Sector 53: Real Estate and Rental and Leasing;
3138 (2) Sector 71: Arts, Entertainment, and Recreation;
3239 or
3340 (3) Sector 72: Accommodation and Food Services.
3441 (d) This section does not prohibit or restrict a school
3542 district or open-enrollment charter school from:
3643 (1) leasing or otherwise providing real property or a
3744 facility that the district or school owns or leases to an individual
3845 or entity for use by that individual or entity if the district or
3946 school is not prohibited from owning or leasing the real property or
4047 facility; or
4148 (2) entering into a lease or other financing
4249 arrangement for district or school property provided by other law,
4350 including with a public facility corporation created under Chapter
4451 303, Local Government Code.
4552 (e) The commissioner may adopt rules necessary to implement
4653 this section.
4754 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
4855 only to real property leased or acquired by a school district or
4956 open-enrollment charter school on or after the effective date of
5057 this Act.
5158 (b) The change in law made by this Act applies to a business
5259 interest in an entity acquired by a school district or
5360 open-enrollment charter school before, on, or after the effective
5461 date of this Act. Except as provided by Subsection (c) of this
5562 section, a school district or open-enrollment charter school
5663 subject to Section 45.116, Education Code, as added by this Act,
5764 shall divest all business interest in an entity described by that
5865 section not later than September 1, 2024, unless the commissioner
5966 determines that the business interest serves a public purpose in
6067 accordance with Section 45.116(b), Education Code, as added by this
6168 Act.
6269 (c) A school district or open-enrollment charter school
6370 subject to Section 45.116, Education Code, as added by this Act,
6471 that owns a natatorium that is associated with an entity that the
6572 district or school must divest under Subsection (b) of this section
6673 may retain ownership of the natatorium and may provide for access
6774 between the natatorium and the associated entity, so long as the
6875 district or school divests the business interest in the associated
6976 entity in accordance with Subsection (b) of this section.
7077 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
78+ * * * * *