Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1138 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 1138


 AN ACT
 relating to securities contracts entered into by the Texas Treasury
 Safekeeping Trust Company.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 404.103, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The trust company may enter into contracts, trust
 agreements, or other fiduciary instruments with the comptroller,
 the Federal Reserve System, a depository trust company, and other
 third parties.  The trust company shall be liable under those
 contracts in accordance with the terms contained in the contracts.
 Notwithstanding any other statute to the contrary, to the extent
 permitted by the Texas Constitution and the contracts, trust
 agreements, or other fiduciary instruments between the trust
 company, the Federal Reserve System, and a depository trust
 company, the trust company's obligations shall be guaranteed by the
 state, and the state expressly waives all defenses of governmental
 immunity by and on behalf of the trust company, the comptroller, and
 the state, and expressly consents to sue and be sued in federal
 court or in any court of competent jurisdiction.  However, this
 provision does not alter or affect the immunity accorded to state
 officials and employees under state law.  The trust company may
 enter into contracts with the comptroller and the Federal Reserve
 System to provide any services that the Federal Reserve System
 makes available, including:
 (1)  safekeeping book-entry United States Treasury and
 agency securities owned by the state and its agencies;
 (2)  using the federal reserve wire transfer system to
 transfer money and book-entry securities and to settle securities
 transactions involving book-entry United States Treasury and
 agency securities owned by the state and its agencies;
 (3)  collecting, through the Federal Reserve System,
 checks deposited with the treasury;
 (4)  receiving payments from and making payments to the
 federal government on behalf of the state and its agencies;
 (5)  originating automated clearinghouse transactions
 or other electronic transfers to make payments on behalf of the
 state and its agencies, collecting revenues due the state and its
 agencies, and transferring money between state depositories;
 (6)  paying warrants drawn on the treasury and
 presented through the Federal Reserve System for payment; and
 (7)  safekeeping collateral pledged to secure deposits
 of public funds.
 (b-1)  In this subsection, "securities contract" includes
 direct security repurchase agreements, reverse security repurchase
 agreements, and related custody agreements. The trust company may
 enter into trust agreements, fiduciary instruments, or other
 contracts as principal or as trustee, with the comptroller and
 other third parties. The trust company shall be liable under the
 agreements, instruments, or contracts in accordance with the terms
 contained in the agreements, instruments, or contracts.
 Notwithstanding any other statute to the contrary, to the extent
 permitted by the Texas Constitution and the contracts, the trust
 company's obligations under securities contracts between the trust
 company and third parties shall be guaranteed by the state with, and
 only to the extent of, the reserve balances held by the trust
 company under Section 404.105, and for those securities contracts,
 the state expressly waives all defenses of governmental immunity by
 and on behalf of the trust company, and expressly consents by and on
 behalf of the trust company to sue and be sued in federal court or in
 any court of competent jurisdiction. However, this provision does
 not alter or affect the immunity accorded to state officials and
 employees under state law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 404.104(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The comptroller may enter into contracts, trust
 agreements, and other instruments with the trust company as
 provided by Section 404.103 [404.103(b)].
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an agreement, instrument, or contract entered into on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  An agreement, instrument, or contract
 entered into before the effective date of this Act is subject to the
 law in effect on the date that the agreement, instrument, or
 contract was entered into, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1138 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1138 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135,
 Nays 9, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor