Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019