Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1164 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 1164


 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of an item bearing a counterfeit
 trademark seized in connection with a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 18, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 18.182 to read as follows:
 Art. 18.182.  DISPOSITION OF ITEM BEARING COUNTERFEIT MARK.
 (a)  In this article, "counterfeit mark" and "protected mark" have
 the meanings assigned by Section 32.23, Penal Code.
 (b)  Following the conviction or placement on deferred
 adjudication community supervision of a person for an offense under
 Section 32.23, Penal Code, the court entering the judgment of
 conviction or order of deferred adjudication community supervision
 shall order that any item bearing or identified by a counterfeit
 mark seized in connection with the offense be:
 (1)  forfeited to the owner of the protected mark, if
 prior to an order disposing of property under this article the owner
 of the protected mark requests the return of the item; or
 (2)  destroyed.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1164 passed the Senate on
 April 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1164 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor