Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1176 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/26/2019

                            86R10407 GCB-F
 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1176


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that the Statewide Behavioral Health
 Coordinating Council prepare a report regarding suicide rates in
 this state and state efforts to prevent suicides.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  LEGISLATIVE FINDINGS; PURPOSE. The
 legislature finds that:
 (1)  suicide is a public health crisis that affects
 residents of all ages in every region of this state; and
 (2)  policymakers need a better understanding of the
 issue to determine the appropriate state and regional efforts
 necessary to decrease suicide rates in this state across different
 ages, places, and groups and to address the patchwork of state laws,
 policies, programs, and efforts that are currently being used to
 address suicide.
 SECTION 2.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Council" means the Statewide Behavioral Health
 Coordinating Council.
 (2)  "Postvention" includes activities that promote
 healing necessary to reduce the risk of suicide by a person affected
 by the suicide of another.
 SECTION 3.  SUMMARY REPORT. (a)  The Health and Human
 Services Commission, in conjunction with the Department of State
 Health Services, shall prepare a summary report on the prevalence
 of suicide in this state and state policies and programs adopted
 across state systems and agencies to prevent suicides. The summary
 report must:
 (1)  include available statewide and regional data on
 the prevalence rates of suicide-related events, including suicidal
 thoughts, suicide attempts, and deaths caused by suicide, that to
 the extent practicable, is presented in a form that:
 (A)  is disaggregated by county and recognized
 categories of risk; and
 (B)  is longitudinal to identify changes in
 suicide prevalence rates since 2000;
 (2)  identify the highest categories of risk with
 correlational data;
 (3)  list state statutes, agency rules, and policies
 related to suicide and suicide prevention, intervention, and
 postvention; and
 (4)  describe state agency initiatives since 2000 to
 address suicide and include the following information relating to
 each initiative:
 (A)  the administering state agency;
 (B)  the funding sources, including whether the
 funding was provided by:
 (i)  a federal block grant;
 (ii)  a federal discretionary grant; or
 (iii)  state appropriations;
 (C)  the years of operation; and
 (D)  whether the initiative is an example of a
 community-based effort to address suicide.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2019, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall provide a copy of the summary report to
 the council, the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of
 the house of representatives, and each standing legislative
 committee with primary jurisdiction over health and mental health.
 SECTION 4.  LEGISLATIVE REPORT. (a)  Using the summary
 report on suicide prepared under Section 3 of this Act and with
 input from the stakeholder workgroup established under Subsection
 (b) of this section, the council shall prepare a legislative report
 on suicide in this state that identifies opportunities and makes
 recommendations, including those that require legislative action,
 for state agencies to:
 (1)  improve statewide and regional data collection on
 suicide-related events;
 (2)  use data to guide and inform decisions and policy
 development relating to suicide prevention; and
 (3)  decrease suicide in this state while targeting the
 highest categories of risk.
 (b)  The council shall establish a stakeholder workgroup to
 assist member agencies in preparing the report that includes:
 (1)  a representative of a nonprofit group that
 supports community-based suicide prevention activities in this
 state; and
 (2)  representatives of other groups involved in
 suicide prevention activities.
 (c)  The chief administrator of each state agency
 represented on the council is entitled to a copy of the legislative
 report prepared under this section.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the council shall
 submit a copy of the legislative report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and each standing legislative committee with primary jurisdiction
 over health and mental health.
 SECTION 5.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.