Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019