Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019