Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1229 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1229
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1229 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a county, city, or independent school district posting
 election results on an Internet website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 65, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 65.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 65.016.  INTERNET POSTING OF ELECTION RESULTS. (a)  A
 county that holds or provides election services for an election and
 maintains an Internet website shall post on its public Internet
 website for an election administered by the county:
 (1)  the results of each election;
 (2)  the total number of votes cast; and
 (3)  the total number of votes cast for each candidate
 or for or against each measure.
 (b)  A city or independent school district that holds an
 election and maintains an Internet website shall post on its public
 Internet website for the city or independent school district, as
 applicable:
 (1)  the results of each election;
 (2)  the total number of votes cast; and
 (3)  the total number of votes cast for each candidate
 or for or against each measure.
 (c)  The information described by Subsections (a) and (b)
 must be:
 (1)  provided as soon as practicable after the
 election; and
 (2)  accessible without having to make more than two
 selections or view more than two network locations after accessing
 the Internet website home page of the county, city, or district, as
 applicable.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *