Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Motion to adopt conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1480
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Postponed 5/17/19 11:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amended 1-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Motion to table fails 1-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2), and Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 11, and Rule 4, Section 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|