Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019