Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019