Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1273 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/19/2019

                            By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1273
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; March 19, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1273 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sales and use tax exemption for certain amusement
 services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.3101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-1) and amending Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  An amusement service remains exclusively provided
 under Subsection (a)(3) or (5) if an entity described by Subsection
 (a)(3) or (5) contracts with another entity not listed in or
 described by Subsection (a) to provide touring theatrical
 productions:
 (1)  subject to a contract with the other entity for:
 (A)  a term of at least five years; and
 (B)  at least five presentations each year; and
 (2)  held at a location either owned by, or leased or
 licensed for a term of at least one year to, the contracting entity
 described by Subsection (a)(3) or (5).
 (c)  In this section:
 (1)  "Educational[, "educational] organization"
 includes an entity described by Section 61.003(8) or (15),
 Education Code.
 (2)  "Theatrical production" means a live staged play,
 musical play, opera, or ballet.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *