Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019