Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1325 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1325
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2019; March 7, 2019,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
4+ Border Security; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to occupational licensing of certain military service
712 members, military veterans, and military spouses by state agencies
813 and political subdivisions.
914 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1015 SECTION 1. Section 55.001, Occupations Code, is amended by
1116 amending Subdivisions (3) and (5) and adding Subdivisions (6-a) and
1217 (6-b) to read as follows:
1318 (3) "License" means a license, certificate,
1419 registration, permit, or other form of authorization required by
1520 law or a state agency or political subdivision rule that must be
1621 obtained by an individual to engage in a particular business.
1722 (5) "Military spouse" means a person who is married to
1823 a military service member or military veteran.
1924 (6-a) "Political subdivision" means a county,
2025 municipality, special district, or other political subdivision of
2126 this state.
2227 (6-b) "Rule" includes an ordinance, order, or
2328 regulation adopted by a political subdivision.
2429 SECTION 2. Section 55.002, Occupations Code, is amended to
2530 read as follows:
2631 Sec. 55.002. EXEMPTION FROM PENALTY FOR FAILURE TO RENEW
2732 LICENSE. A state agency or a political subdivision that issues a
2833 license shall adopt rules to exempt an individual who holds a
2934 license issued by the agency or political subdivision from any
3035 increased fee or other penalty imposed by the agency or political
3136 subdivision for failing to renew the license in a timely manner if
3237 the individual establishes to the satisfaction of the agency or
3338 political subdivision that the individual failed to renew the
3439 license in a timely manner because the individual was serving as a
3540 military service member.
3641 SECTION 3. Section 55.003, Occupations Code, is amended to
3742 read as follows:
3843 Sec. 55.003. EXTENSION OF LICENSE RENEWAL DEADLINES FOR
3944 MILITARY SERVICE MEMBERS. A military service member who holds a
4045 license issued by a state agency or political subdivision is
4146 entitled to two years of additional time to complete:
4247 (1) any continuing education requirements; and
4348 (2) any other requirement related to the renewal of
4449 the military service member's license.
4550 SECTION 4. Section 55.004, Occupations Code, is amended to
4651 read as follows:
4752 Sec. 55.004. ALTERNATIVE LICENSING FOR MILITARY SERVICE
4853 MEMBERS, MILITARY VETERANS, AND MILITARY SPOUSES. (a) A state
4954 agency or political subdivision that issues a license shall adopt
5055 rules for the issuance of the license to an applicant who is a
5156 military service member, military veteran, or military spouse and:
5257 (1) holds a current license issued by another
5358 jurisdiction that has licensing requirements that are
5459 substantially equivalent to the requirements for the license in
5560 this state or the political subdivision, as applicable; or
5661 (2) within the five years preceding the application
5762 date held the license in this state or the political subdivision, as
5863 applicable.
5964 (b) The executive director of a state agency or the person
6065 overseeing licensing of an occupation by a political subdivision
6166 may waive any prerequisite to obtaining a license for an applicant
6267 described by Subsection (a) after reviewing the applicant's
6368 credentials.
6469 (c) In addition to the rules adopted under Subsection (a), a
6570 state agency or political subdivision that issues a license may
6671 adopt rules that would establish alternate methods for a military
6772 service member, military veteran, or military spouse to demonstrate
6873 competency to meet the requirements for obtaining the license.
6974 SECTION 5. Section 55.009, Occupations Code, is amended to
7075 read as follows:
7176 Sec. 55.009. LICENSE APPLICATION AND EXAMINATION FEES.
7277 Notwithstanding any other law, a state agency or political
7378 subdivision that issues a license shall waive the license
7479 application and examination fees paid to the state or political
7580 subdivision for an applicant who is:
7681 (1) a military service member or military veteran
7782 whose military service, training, or education substantially meets
7883 all of the requirements for the license; or
7984 (2) a military service member, military veteran, or
8085 military spouse who holds a current license issued by another
8186 jurisdiction that has licensing requirements that are
8287 substantially equivalent to the requirements for the license in
8388 this state or the political subdivision, as applicable.
8489 SECTION 6. Section 55.010, Occupations Code, is amended to
8590 read as follows:
8691 Sec. 55.010. NOTICE OF CHAPTER PROVISIONS. (a) A state
8792 agency that issues a license shall prominently post a notice on the
8893 home page of the agency's Internet website describing the
8994 provisions of this chapter that are available to military service
9095 members, military veterans, and military spouses.
9196 (b) The Texas Veterans Commission shall establish and
9297 maintain an Internet website to serve as a single location for
9398 military service members, military veterans, and military spouses
9499 to access information regarding the issuance of a license by a state
95100 agency to a military service member, military veteran, or military
96101 spouse who is licensed in another jurisdiction.
97102 SECTION 7. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
98103 Veterans Commission shall establish the Internet website required
99104 by Section 55.010(b), Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
100105 SECTION 8. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
101106 an initial application for or an application for renewal of an
102107 occupational license filed on or after the effective date of this
103108 Act. An application for a license filed before the effective date
104109 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before that
105110 date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
106111 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
112+ * * * * *