Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1355 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Powell, Zaffirini S.B. No. 1355
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2019; March 7, 2019,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
4+ Economic Development; May 9, 2019, reported favorably by the
5+ following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to the establishment of the work-based learning task
712 force.
813 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
914 SECTION 1. Chapter 133, Education Code, is amended by
1015 adding Section 133.010 to read as follows:
11- Sec. 133.010. WORK-BASED LEARNING TASK FORCE. (a) In this
12- section:
16+ Sec. 133.010. WORK-BASED LEARNING TASK FORCE. (a) In
17+ this section:
1318 (1) "Agency" means the Texas Education Agency.
1419 (2) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
1520 Education Coordinating Board.
1621 (3) "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
1722 assigned by Section 61.003.
1823 (4) "Open-enrollment charter school" has the meaning
1924 assigned by Section 5.001.
2025 (5) "Task force" means the work-based learning task
2126 force established under this section.
2227 (6) "Work-based learning opportunity" includes a
2328 youth or adult apprenticeship or internship that provides paid work
2429 experience and corresponding classroom instruction, delivered in
2530 an employment relationship that both the business and worker intend
2631 to lead to an industry-recognized credential and full-time
2732 employment after completion of the program.
2833 (b) The work-based learning task force is established to
2934 develop strategies for expanding and improving the delivery of
3035 work-based learning opportunities in this state.
3136 (c) The task force is composed of the following 18 members:
3237 (1) one member of the commission, appointed by the
3338 executive director of the commission;
3439 (2) one member of the coordinating board, appointed by
3540 the commissioner of higher education;
3641 (3) one member of the agency, appointed by the
3742 commissioner of education;
3843 (4) five members appointed by the governor as follows:
3944 (A) one member from a school district or
4045 open-enrollment charter school;
4146 (B) one member from an institution of higher
4247 education;
4348 (C) two members from a high-growth, high-wage
4449 industry; and
4550 (D) one member from a statewide advocacy
4651 organization representing young adults, a statewide education
4752 advocacy organization, or a student organization that focuses on
4853 apprenticeships;
4954 (5) five members appointed by the lieutenant governor
5055 as follows:
5156 (A) one member from a school district or
5257 open-enrollment charter school;
5358 (B) one member from an institution of higher
5459 education;
5560 (C) two members from a high-growth, high-wage
5661 industry; and
5762 (D) one member from a statewide advocacy
5863 organization representing young adults, a statewide education
5964 advocacy organization, or a student organization that focuses on
6065 apprenticeships; and
6166 (6) five members appointed by the speaker of the house
6267 of representatives as follows:
6368 (A) one member from a school district or
6469 open-enrollment charter school;
6570 (B) one member from an institution of higher
6671 education;
6772 (C) two members from a high-growth, high-wage
6873 industry; and
6974 (D) one member from a statewide advocacy
7075 organization representing young adults, a statewide education
7176 advocacy organization, or a student organization that focuses on
7277 apprenticeships.
7378 (d) The members of the task force shall select a presiding
7479 officer from among the membership.
7580 (e) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
7681 officer.
7782 (f) A member of the task force serves at the will of the
7883 member's appointing authority. A vacancy on the task force must be
7984 filled in the same manner as the original appointment.
8085 (g) A member of the task force may not receive compensation
8186 for serving on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for
8287 travel expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
8388 business of the task force as provided by the General
8489 Appropriations Act.
8590 (h) The commission, the coordinating board, and the agency
8691 shall each provide necessary administrative and technical support
8792 for the activities of the task force.
8893 (i) The task force may solicit gifts, grants, and donations
8994 from any public or private source for use in carrying out the task
9095 force's duties under this section.
9196 (j) The task force shall:
9297 (1) develop recommendations for:
9398 (A) increasing the number of work-based learning
9499 opportunities in this state and the availability of those
95100 opportunities, including for persons experiencing barriers to
96101 employment and who are historically underrepresented in
97102 high-growth, high-wage industries, with a particular focus on
98103 occupations other than building and construction trades;
99104 (B) removing barriers that impede the growth of
100105 work-based learning opportunities in this state, including in small
101106 and mid-size companies and in industries that have not historically
102107 offered work-based learning opportunities;
103108 (C) addressing employer concerns regarding
104109 liability for work-based learning opportunities;
105110 (D) improving a diverse pipeline of access to and
106111 success in work-based learning opportunities, including assistance
107112 with child care, food, and transportation;
108113 (E) aligning public and private funding for
109114 work-based learning opportunities;
110115 (F) identifying data to be collected from
111116 work-based learning opportunity providers; and
112117 (G) establishing a process for the collection and
113118 maintenance of data described by Paragraph (F) and for the
114119 reporting of that data to policymakers and the public;
115120 (2) develop critical guidance for local sector or
116121 industry partnerships on how to serve as intermediaries
117122 facilitating work-based learning opportunities, including guidance
118123 regarding:
119124 (A) marketing work-based learning opportunities
120125 to community stakeholders;
121126 (B) assisting business in establishing
122127 work-based learning opportunities; and
123128 (C) providing or brokering education and
124129 training for individuals experiencing barriers to employment; and
125130 (3) identify any resources that are needed, and any
126131 current resources that could be redirected, to expand work-based
127132 learning opportunities in this state.
128133 (k) In carrying out its duties under this section, the task
129134 force shall consult with stakeholders, including young adults
130135 participating in work-based learning opportunities.
131136 (l) Not later than December 1, 2020, the task force shall
132137 submit a written report to the legislature, the commission, the
133138 coordinating board, and the agency that includes:
134139 (1) the task force's findings;
135140 (2) a summary of the stakeholder input received by the
136141 task force;
137142 (3) recommendations for legislative or other action
138143 and proposed legislation; and
139144 (4) a statement regarding the feasibility of the task
140145 force's recommendations.
141146 (m) The task force is abolished and this section expires
142147 September 1, 2021.
143148 SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date
144149 of this Act, the appropriate persons shall appoint the members of
145150 the task force created by Section 133.010, Education Code, as added
146151 by this Act.
147152 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
153+ * * * * *