LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2019 - 86th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1358
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1358
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1358
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 1, 2019
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 11, 2019
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 6, 2019
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 30, 2019
Compare
Bill
March 27, 2019
Compare