Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1363 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/21/2019

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1363
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2019; March 7, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 21, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 21, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1363 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to highway maintenance or construction vehicles and
 certain service vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.157(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to the following vehicles:
 (1)  a stationary authorized emergency vehicle using
 visual signals that meet the requirements of Sections 547.305 and
 547.702;
 (2)  a stationary tow truck using equipment authorized
 by Section 547.305(d); [and]
 (3)  a Texas Department of Transportation vehicle or a
 highway maintenance or construction vehicle operated pursuant to a
 contract awarded under Subchapter A, Chapter 223, not separated
 from the roadway by a traffic control channelizing device and using
 visual signals that comply with the standards and specifications
 adopted under Section 547.105; and
 (4)  a service vehicle used by or for a utility, as
 defined by Section 203.091, and using visual signals that comply
 with the standards and specifications adopted under Section
 547.105.
 SECTION 2.  Section 547.001(2-b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2-b)  "Highway maintenance or construction vehicle"
 means a highway or traffic maintenance or construction vehicle
 designated by the Texas Department of Transportation.  The term
 includes equipment for:
 (A)  road maintenance or construction, including:
 (i)  equipment for snow removal, line
 striping, skid resistance testing, sweeping, [and] spraying,
 guardrail repair, sign maintenance, and temporary traffic-control
 device placement or removal;
 (ii)  aerial platform lift machines; and
 (iii)  road profiler machines; and
 (B)  road construction or off-road use, including
 motor graders, road rollers, excavators, pneumatic tire equipment,
 movers, and tractors.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 547.105, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 547.105.  [MAINTENANCE AND SERVICE VEHICLE] LIGHTING
 STANDARDS FOR CERTAIN VEHICLES.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 547.105(a) and (b), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Department of Transportation shall adopt
 standards and specifications that:
 (1)  apply to lamps on highway maintenance or
 construction vehicles and service vehicles; and
 (2)  correlate with and conform as closely as possible
 to standards and specifications approved by the American
 Association of State Highway and Transportation Officials.
 (b)  The Texas Department of Transportation may adopt
 standards and specifications for lighting that permit the use of
 flashing lights for identification purposes on highway maintenance
 or construction vehicles and service vehicles.
 SECTION 5.  Section 547.305(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  A person may not operate a highway maintenance or
 construction vehicle or service vehicle that is not equipped with
 lamps or that does not display lighted lamps as required by the
 standards and specifications adopted by the Texas Department of
 Transportation.
 SECTION 6.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Department of Transportation shall adopt
 standards and specifications relating to lamps and lighting on
 highway construction vehicles, as required by Section 547.105,
 Transportation Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *