Senate | 04/09/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |