Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019