Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill May 7, 2019