House
|
05/20/2019
|
Returned to committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|