Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1402 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/15/2019

                            S.B. No. 1402


 AN ACT
 relating to regulation by certain counties of lots in platted
 subdivisions that have remained undeveloped.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 232, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 232.045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 232.045.  APPLICABILITY OF INFRASTRUCTURE REQUIREMENTS
 TO LOTS UNDEVELOPED FOR 25 YEARS OR MORE. (a)  This section applies
 only to a county with a population of more than 800,000 that is
 adjacent to an international border.
 (b)  A commissioners court by order may implement a process:
 (1)  applicable to a subdivision in which 50 percent or
 more of the lots are undeveloped or unoccupied on or after the 25th
 anniversary of the date the plat for the subdivision was recorded
 with the county; and
 (2)  through which the county, to the extent
 practicable, may apply to the subdivision more current street,
 road, drainage, and other infrastructure requirements.
 (c)  A regulation or standard adopted by a county under this
 section must be no less stringent than the minimum standards and
 other requirements under the model rules for safe and sanitary
 water supply and sewer services adopted under Section 16.343, Water
 Code, and any other minimum public safety standards that would
 otherwise be applicable to the subdivision.
 (d)  A regulation or standard adopted by a county under this
 section applies only to a lot that is owned by an individual, firm,
 corporation, or other legal entity that directly or indirectly
 offers lots for sale or lease as part of a common promotional plan
 in the ordinary course of business, and each regulation or standard
 must expressly state that limitation. For the purposes of this
 subsection, "common promotional plan" means a plan or scheme of
 operation undertaken by a person or a group acting in concert,
 either personally or through an agent, to offer for sale or lease
 more than two lots when the land is:
 (1)  contiguous or part of the same area of land; or
 (2)  known, designated, or advertised as a common unit
 or by a common name.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.045, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act, does not apply to property that was the subject of a
 settlement agreement and release incorporating an agreed final
 judgment that was effective on or before May 1, 2017, or any
 property that was the subject of an amendment to such settlement
 agreement and release that was subsequently entered into by the
 parties.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1402 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1402 passed the House on
 May 14, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 12, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor