Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1409 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/23/2019

                            By: Hall S.B. No. 1409
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture;
 April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 1; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration, implementation, and enforcement of
 federal produce safety standards by the Department of Agriculture.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 91.009(a), (c-1), and (d), Agriculture
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall administer, implement, and enforce
 in this state [is the lead agency for the administration,
 implementation, and enforcement of, and education and training
 relating to,] the United States Food and Drug Administration
 Standards for the Growing, Harvesting, Packing, and Holding of
 Produce for Human Consumption (21 C.F.R. Part 112) or any successor
 federal produce safety rule or standard.
 (c-1)  The department may enter into a cooperative
 agreement, interagency agreement, grant agreement, or memorandum
 of understanding with a federal or state agency as necessary to
 carry out the department's [for the] administration,
 implementation, or enforcement of this section.
 (d)  The department may adopt rules to administer,
 implement, and enforce this section.  The department's rules may
 not impose additional or more burdensome requirements than those
 provided by the applicable federal rule or standard described by
 Subsection (a).  In the development of rules under this section, the
 department may consider relevant state, federal, or national
 standards and may consult with federal or state agencies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *