Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1414 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2019

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 1414
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 10, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 10, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1414 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees regarding a residential tenant's failure to timely
 pay rent.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 92.019, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsections (a-1)
 and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  A landlord may not collect from [charge] a tenant a late
 fee for failing to pay any portion of the tenant's rent unless:
 (1)  notice of the fee is included in a written lease;
 (2)  the fee is [a] reasonable [estimate of uncertain
 damages to the landlord that are incapable of precise calculation
 and result from late payment of rent]; and
 (3)  any portion of the tenant's rent has remained
 unpaid two [one] full days [day] after the date the rent was
 originally due.
 (a-1)  A tenant may request that the landlord provide to the
 tenant a written statement of whether the tenant owes a late fee to
 the landlord and, if so, the amount of the late fee. The landlord
 may provide the statement to the tenant by any established means
 regularly used for written communication between the landlord and
 the tenant.  A landlord's failure to respond does not affect the
 tenant's liability for any late fee owed to the landlord.
 (a-2)  For purposes of this section, a late fee is considered
 reasonable if the late fee does not exceed 12 percent of the amount
 of rent for the rental period under the lease.  A late fee that
 exceeds 12 percent of the amount of rent for the rental period under
 the lease is considered reasonable if the late fee does not exceed
 uncertain damages to the landlord related to late payment of rent,
 including direct or indirect expenses, direct or indirect costs, or
 overhead associated with the collection of late payment.
 (b)  A late fee under this section may include an initial fee
 and a daily fee for each day any portion of the tenant's rent
 continues to remain unpaid, and the combined fees are considered a
 single late fee for purposes of this section.
 (c)  A landlord who violates this section is liable to the
 tenant for an amount equal to the sum of $100, three times the
 amount of the late fee collected [charged] in violation of this
 section, and the tenant's reasonable attorney's fees.
 SECTION 2.  Section 92.019, Property Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a late fee under a lease entered into or
 renewed on or after the effective date of this Act. A late fee under
 a lease entered into or renewed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *