Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1414 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 1414


 AN ACT
 relating to fees regarding a residential tenant's failure to timely
 pay rent.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 92.019, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (a-1)
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A landlord may not collect from [charge] a tenant a late
 fee for failing to pay any portion of the tenant's rent unless:
 (1)  notice of the fee is included in a written lease;
 (2)  the fee is [a] reasonable [estimate of uncertain
 damages to the landlord that are incapable of precise calculation
 and result from late payment of rent]; and
 (3)  any portion of the tenant's rent has remained
 unpaid two [one] full days [day] after the date the rent was
 originally due.
 (a-1)  For purposes of this section, a late fee is considered
 reasonable if:
 (1)  the late fee is not more than:
 (A)  12 percent of the amount of rent for the
 rental period under the lease for a dwelling located in a structure
 that contains not more than four dwelling units; or
 (B)  10 percent of the amount of rent for the
 rental period under the lease for a dwelling located in a structure
 that contains more than four dwelling units; or
 (2)  the late fee is more than the applicable amount
 under Subdivision (1), but not more than uncertain damages to the
 landlord related to the late payment of rent, including direct or
 indirect expenses, direct or indirect costs, or overhead associated
 with the collection of late payment.
 (b)  A late fee under this section may include an initial fee
 and a daily fee for each day any portion of the tenant's rent
 continues to remain unpaid, and the combined fees are considered a
 single late fee for purposes of this section.
 (c)  A landlord who violates this section is liable to the
 tenant for an amount equal to the sum of $100, three times the
 amount of the late fee collected [charged] in violation of this
 section, and the tenant's reasonable attorney's fees.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 92, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 92.0191 to read as follows:
 Sec. 92.0191.  STATEMENT OF LATE FEES.  A tenant may request
 that the landlord provide to the tenant a written statement of
 whether the tenant owes a late fee to the landlord and, if so, the
 amount of the late fee. On request of the tenant, the landlord
 shall provide the statement to the tenant by any established means
 regularly used for written communication between the landlord and
 the tenant.  A landlord's failure to respond does not affect the
 tenant's liability for any late fee owed to the landlord.
 SECTION 3.  Section 92.019, Property Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a late fee under a lease entered into or
 renewed on or after the effective date of this Act. A late fee under
 a lease entered into or renewed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1414 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1414 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 94,
 Nays 52, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor