Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019