Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1433 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2019

                            86R9337 JCG-D
 By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1433


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.059, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 455.059.  INSPECTIONS; INVESTIGATIONS.  (a) The
 department, the department's authorized representative, or a peace
 officer may enter the premises of a massage establishment or
 massage school at:
 (1)  reasonable times to conduct an inspection
 incidental to the issuance of a license; and
 (2)  other times that the department, the department's
 authorized representative, or a peace officer considers necessary
 to ensure compliance with this chapter and the rules adopted under
 this chapter.
 (b)  During an inspection or investigation under Subsection
 (a), a peace officer may require a massage therapist to provide the
 therapist's fingerprints in the manner prescribed by commission
 rule.
 SECTION 2.  Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.1525.  CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
 REQUIREMENT FOR LICENSE ISSUANCE [BACKGROUND CHECKS]. (a)  The
 department shall require an applicant for a license to submit a
 complete and legible set of fingerprints, on a form prescribed by
 the department, to the department or to the Department of Public
 Safety for the purpose of obtaining criminal history record
 information from the Department of Public Safety and the Federal
 Bureau of Investigation  [On receipt of an application for a license
 under this chapter, the department shall conduct a criminal
 background check on the applicant].
 (b)  The department may not issue a license to a person who
 does not comply with the requirement of Subsection (a).
 (c)  The department shall conduct a criminal history record
 information check of each applicant for a license using
 information:
 (1)  provided by the individual under this section; and
 (2)  made available to the department by the Department
 of Public Safety, the Federal Bureau of Investigation, and any
 other criminal justice agency under Chapter 411, Government Code.
 (d)  The department may:
 (1)  enter into an agreement with the Department of
 Public Safety to administer a criminal history record information
 check required under this section; and
 (2)  authorize the Department of Public Safety to
 collect from each applicant the costs incurred by the Department of
 Public Safety in conducting the criminal history record information
 check.
 (e)  For purposes of this section, if the applicant for a
 license is an entity, the applicant must submit fingerprints as
 required by Subsection (a) for each individual who:
 (1)  personally or constructively holds, including as
 the beneficiary of a trust:
 (A)  at least 10 percent of the entity's
 outstanding stock; or
 (B)  more than $25,000 of the fair market value of
 the entity;
 (2)  has the controlling interest in the entity;
 (3)  has a direct or indirect participating interest
 through shares, stock, or otherwise, regardless of whether voting
 rights are included, of more than 10 percent of the profits,
 proceeds, or capital gains of the entity;
 (4)  is a member of the board of directors or other
 governing body of the entity; or
 (5)  serves as:
 (A)  an elected officer of the entity; or
 (B)  a general manager of the entity.
 SECTION 3.  Section 455.202, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  A massage establishment may not:
 (1)  employ an individual who is not a United States
 citizen or a legal permanent resident with a valid work permit;
 (2)  employ a minor unless the minor's parent or legal
 guardian authorizes in writing the minor's employment by the
 establishment;
 (3)  allow a nude or partially nude employee to provide
 massage therapy or other massage services to a customer;
 (4)  allow any individual, including a client, student,
 license holder, or employee, to engage in sexual contact in the
 massage establishment; [or]
 (5)  allow any individual, including a student, license
 holder, or employee, to practice massage therapy in the nude or in
 clothing designed to arouse or gratify the sexual desire of any
 individual; or
 (6)  allow any individual, including a student, license
 holder, or employee, to reside on the premises of the massage
 establishment.
 (e)  Subsection (b)(6) does not apply to:
 (1)  a place of business exempted under Section
 455.155(c)(2) from the requirement to hold a license as a massage
 establishment; or
 (2)  a licensed massage therapist who practices as a
 solo practitioner and who is exempted under Section 455.155(b) from
 the requirement to hold a license as a massage establishment.
 SECTION 4.  Section 455.204, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The license of a massage therapist that is posted
 under Subsection (b) must have attached to the front of the license
 a photograph of the massage therapist.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter E, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 455.207 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.207.  POSTING OF CERTAIN NOTICES REQUIRED. (a)
 Each massage establishment and massage school shall display in the
 form and manner prescribed by the commission a sign concerning
 services and assistance available to victims of human trafficking.
 (b)  The sign required by this section must:
 (1)  be in English, Spanish, Korean, Mandarin, and any
 other language required by commission rule;
 (2)  include a toll-free telephone number of a
 nationally recognized information and referral hotline for victims
 of human trafficking; and
 (3)  be displayed in a conspicuous place clearly
 visible to the public.
 (c)  The commission by rule shall establish requirements
 regarding the posting of signs under this section.
 SECTION 6.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement the changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 455,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an application for a license
 submitted on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 application for a license submitted before that date is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the application was submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2021, the Texas Department
 of Licensing and Regulation shall obtain criminal history record
 information on each person who, on the effective date of this Act,
 holds a license issued under Chapter 455, Occupations Code, and did
 not undergo a criminal history record information check based on
 the license holder's fingerprints on initial application for the
 license. The department may suspend the license of a license holder
 who does not provide the criminal history record information as
 required by the department and this subsection.
 SECTION 8.  A massage establishment, as defined by Section
 455.001, Occupations Code, shall comply with:
 (1)  Section 455.204(b-1), Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act, not later than January 1, 2020; and
 (2)  Section 455.207, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than November 1, 2019.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.