By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1441 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2019; March 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 2, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board comparing postsecondary educational outcomes for certain traditional and nontraditional students. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.06692 to read as follows: Sec. 61.06692. STUDY COMPARING POSTSECONDARY EDUCATIONAL OUTCOMES FOR CERTAIN TRADITIONAL AND NONTRADITIONAL STUDENTS. (a) The board shall conduct a study comparing postsecondary educational outcomes for students enrolled at institutions of higher education who received a high school diploma and students enrolled at those institutions who received a high school equivalency certificate, disaggregated by the high school equivalency examination completed. (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the board shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives a report on the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or other action. (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *