4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating |
---|
6 | 8 | | Board comparing postsecondary educational outcomes for certain |
---|
7 | 9 | | traditional and nontraditional students. |
---|
8 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
10 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 61.06692 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 13 | | Sec. 61.06692. STUDY COMPARING POSTSECONDARY EDUCATIONAL |
---|
12 | 14 | | OUTCOMES FOR CERTAIN TRADITIONAL AND NONTRADITIONAL STUDENTS. |
---|
13 | 15 | | (a) The board shall conduct a study comparing postsecondary |
---|
14 | 16 | | educational outcomes for students enrolled at institutions of |
---|
15 | 17 | | higher education who received a high school diploma and students |
---|
16 | 18 | | enrolled at those institutions who received a high school |
---|
17 | 19 | | equivalency certificate, disaggregated by the high school |
---|
18 | 20 | | equivalency examination completed. |
---|
19 | 21 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2020, the board shall submit |
---|
20 | 22 | | to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the |
---|
21 | 23 | | house of representatives a report on the results of the study and |
---|
22 | 24 | | any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
23 | 25 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
24 | 26 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
25 | 27 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
26 | 28 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
27 | 29 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
28 | 30 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1441 passed the Senate on |
---|
32 | | - | May 7, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
35 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1441 passed the House on |
---|
36 | | - | May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 20, two |
---|
37 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
40 | | - | Approved: |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Date |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Governor |
---|