Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1441 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2019

                    S.B. No. 1441


 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board comparing postsecondary educational outcomes for certain
 traditional and nontraditional students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.06692 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.06692.  STUDY COMPARING POSTSECONDARY EDUCATIONAL
 OUTCOMES FOR CERTAIN TRADITIONAL AND NONTRADITIONAL STUDENTS.
 (a)  The board shall conduct a study comparing postsecondary
 educational outcomes for students enrolled at institutions of
 higher education who received a high school diploma and students
 enrolled at those institutions who received a high school
 equivalency certificate, disaggregated by the high school
 equivalency examination completed.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the board shall submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the
 house of representatives a report on the results of the study and
 any recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1441 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1441 passed the House on
 May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 124, Nays 20, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor