Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1443 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    S.B. No. 1443


 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Military Preparedness Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 436.105(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The task force is abolished and this section expires
 September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  Section 436.205(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The panel shall evaluate each grant application and
 assign the applicant a score based on:
 (1)  the significance of the adverse or positive effect
 within the local governmental entity[, including the number of jobs
 that may be lost or gained in relation to the workforce in the local
 governmental entity's jurisdiction and the effect on the entity's
 and surrounding area's economy and tax revenue]; and
 (2)  any other criteria established by the commission
 [the extent to which the local governmental entity may have used its
 existing resources to promote local economic development;
 [(3)     the amount of any grant that the local
 governmental entity has previously received under this subchapter;
 [(4)     the anticipated number of jobs that may be
 created or retained in relation to the amount of the grant sought;
 and
 [(5)     the extent to which the grant will affect the
 region in which the local governmental entity is located].
 SECTION 3.  Section 436.207, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1443 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1443 passed the House on
 May 3, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor