Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019