Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1497 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            S.B. No. 1497


 AN ACT
 relating to the registration and regulation of brokers by the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.3555 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.3555.  REGISTRATION OF BROKERS. (a) In this
 section, "brokerage services" means providing advice or
 procurement services to, or acting on behalf of, a retail electric
 customer regarding the selection of a retail electric provider, or
 a product or service offered by a retail electric provider.
 (b)  A person may not provide brokerage services, including
 brokerage services offered online, in this state for compensation
 or other consideration unless the person is registered with the
 commission as a broker.
 (c)  A retail electric provider may not register as a broker.
 A broker may not sell or take title to electric energy.
 (d)  A retail electric provider may not knowingly provide
 bids or offers to a person who:
 (1)  provides brokerage services in this state for
 compensation or other consideration; and
 (2)  has not registered as a broker with the
 commission.
 (e)  A person who registers under this section shall comply
 with customer protection provisions, disclosure requirements, and
 marketing guidelines established by the commission and by this
 chapter and Chapter 17.
 (f)  The commission shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 (g)  The commission shall process a person's application for
 registration as a broker not later than the 60th day after the date
 the person files the application.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1497 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1497 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 95,
 Nays 38, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor