Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1510 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 1510


 AN ACT
 relating to the apportionment of infrastructure costs in regard to
 certain property development projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 212.904(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If a municipality requires, including under an
 agreement under Chapter 242, as a condition of approval for a
 property development project that the developer bear a portion of
 the costs of municipal infrastructure improvements by the making of
 dedications, the payment of fees, or the payment of construction
 costs, the developer's portion of the costs may not exceed the
 amount required for infrastructure improvements that are roughly
 proportionate to the proposed development as approved by a
 professional engineer who holds a license issued under Chapter
 1001, Occupations Code, and is retained by the municipality.  The
 municipality's determination shall be completed within thirty days
 following the submission of the developer's application for
 determination under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 232, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 232.110 to read as follows:
 Sec. 232.110.  APPORTIONMENT OF COUNTY INFRASTRUCTURE
 COSTS. (a) If, under any authority expressly authorized by this
 chapter, a county requires, including under an agreement under
 Chapter 242, as a condition of approval for a property development
 project that the developer bear a portion of the costs of county
 infrastructure improvements by the making of dedications, the
 payment of fees, or the payment of construction costs, the
 developer's portion of the costs may not exceed the amount required
 for infrastructure improvements that are roughly proportionate to
 the proposed development as approved by a professional engineer who
 holds a license issued under Chapter 1001, Occupations Code, and is
 retained by the county.  The county's determination shall be
 completed within thirty days following the submission of the
 developer's application for determination under this subsection.
 (b)  A developer who disputes the determination made under
 Subsection (a) may appeal to the commissioners court of the county.
 At the appeal, the developer may present evidence and testimony
 under procedures adopted by the commissioners court. After hearing
 any testimony and reviewing the evidence, the commissioners court
 shall make the applicable determination within 30 days following
 the final submission of any testimony or evidence by the developer.
 (c)  A developer may appeal the determination of the
 commissioners court to a county or district court of the county in
 which the development project is located within 30 days of the final
 determination by the commissioners court.
 (d)  A county may not require a developer to waive the right
 of appeal authorized by this section as a condition of approval for
 a development project.
 (e)  A developer who prevails in an appeal under this section
 is entitled to applicable costs and to reasonable attorney's fees,
 including expert witness fees.
 (f)  This section does not diminish the authority or modify
 the procedures specified by Chapter 395.
 (g)  This section does not increase or expand, and shall not
 be interpreted to increase or expand, the authority of a county to
 regulate plats or subdivisions under this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 approval of a development project that is not finally adjudicated
 before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1510 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1510 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor