| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2019; March 14, 2019, read |
---|
| 3 | + | first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border |
---|
| 4 | + | Security; April 9, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 6, Nays 1; April 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
2 | 7 | | |
---|
3 | 8 | | |
---|
4 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 11 | | relating to the establishment of a pilot program for certain |
---|
7 | 12 | | students who are veterans. |
---|
8 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 130, Education Code, is |
---|
10 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 130.095 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 16 | | Sec. 130.095. VETERAN INTEREST GROUPS PILOT PROGRAM. |
---|
12 | 17 | | (a) The Alamo Community College District shall implement a pilot |
---|
13 | 18 | | program to establish veteran interest groups for students enrolled |
---|
14 | 19 | | in the district who are veterans. |
---|
15 | 20 | | (b) The district shall ensure that students assigned to a |
---|
16 | 21 | | group established under the pilot program enroll in at least three |
---|
17 | 22 | | of the same classes as the other students assigned to the group. |
---|
18 | 23 | | (c) Students assigned to a group established under the pilot |
---|
19 | 24 | | program shall attend a weekly seminar led by a peer mentor and a |
---|
20 | 25 | | staff facilitator in which the students: |
---|
21 | 26 | | (1) learn content related to the needs of students who |
---|
22 | 27 | | are veterans; |
---|
23 | 28 | | (2) discuss study and time management strategies and |
---|
24 | 29 | | other issues; |
---|
25 | 30 | | (3) engage in campus life and other involvement |
---|
26 | 31 | | opportunities; and |
---|
27 | 32 | | (4) participate in social opportunities. |
---|
28 | 33 | | (d) Not later than January 1, 2021, the district shall |
---|
29 | 34 | | prepare a report on the effectiveness of the pilot program in |
---|
30 | 35 | | promoting the success of students who are veterans and submit the |
---|
31 | 36 | | report to the standing committees of each house of the legislature |
---|
32 | 37 | | with primary jurisdiction over higher education matters and matters |
---|
33 | 38 | | concerning veterans affairs. |
---|
34 | 39 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
35 | 40 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
36 | 41 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
37 | 42 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
38 | 43 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
39 | 44 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|