Senate | 05/15/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |