7 | | - | SECTION 1. Sections 481.0765(a) and (b), Health and Safety |
---|
8 | | - | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
9 | | - | (a) A prescriber is not subject to the requirements of |
---|
10 | | - | Section 481.0764(a) if: |
---|
11 | | - | (1) the patient has been diagnosed with cancer or |
---|
12 | | - | sickle cell disease or the patient is receiving hospice care; and |
---|
13 | | - | (2) the prescriber clearly notes in the prescription |
---|
14 | | - | record that the patient was diagnosed with cancer or sickle cell |
---|
15 | | - | disease or is receiving hospice care, as applicable. |
---|
16 | | - | (b) A dispenser is not subject to the requirements of |
---|
17 | | - | Section 481.0764(a) if it is clearly noted in the prescription |
---|
18 | | - | record that the patient has been diagnosed with cancer or sickle |
---|
19 | | - | cell disease or is receiving hospice care. |
---|
20 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, |
---|
21 | | - | is amended by adding Section 32.03115 to read as follows: |
---|
22 | | - | Sec. 32.03115. REIMBURSEMENT FOR MEDICATION-ASSISTED |
---|
23 | | - | TREATMENT FOR OPIOID OR SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER. (a) In this |
---|
24 | | - | section, "medication-assisted opioid or substance use disorder |
---|
25 | | - | treatment" means the use of methadone, buprenorphine, oral |
---|
26 | | - | buprenorphine/naloxone, or naltrexone to treat opioid or substance |
---|
27 | | - | use disorder. |
---|
28 | | - | (b) Notwithstanding Sections 531.072 and 531.073, |
---|
29 | | - | Government Code, or any other law and subject to Subsections (c) and |
---|
30 | | - | (d), the commission shall provide medical assistance reimbursement |
---|
31 | | - | for medication-assisted opioid or substance use disorder treatment |
---|
32 | | - | without requiring a recipient of medical assistance or health care |
---|
33 | | - | provider to obtain prior authorization or precertification for the |
---|
34 | | - | treatment. |
---|
35 | | - | (c) The duty to provide medical assistance reimbursement |
---|
36 | | - | for medication-assisted opioid or substance use disorder treatment |
---|
37 | | - | under Subsection (b) does not apply with respect to: |
---|
38 | | - | (1) a prescription for methadone; |
---|
39 | | - | (2) a recipient for whom medication-assisted opioid or |
---|
40 | | - | substance use disorder treatment is determined to be medically |
---|
41 | | - | contraindicated by the recipient's physician; or |
---|
42 | | - | (3) a recipient who is subject to an age-related |
---|
43 | | - | restriction applicable to medication-assisted opioid or substance |
---|
44 | | - | use disorder treatment. |
---|
45 | | - | (d) The commission may provide medical assistance |
---|
46 | | - | reimbursement for medication-assisted opioid or substance use |
---|
47 | | - | disorder treatment only if the treatment is prescribed to a |
---|
48 | | - | recipient of medical assistance by a licensed health care provider |
---|
49 | | - | who is authorized to prescribe methadone, buprenorphine, oral |
---|
50 | | - | buprenorphine/naloxone, or naltrexone. |
---|
51 | | - | (e) This section expires August 31, 2023. |
---|
52 | | - | SECTION 3. (a) In this section, "qualifying practitioner" |
---|
| 10 | + | SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "qualifying practitioner" |
---|
53 | 11 | | has the meaning assigned by 21 U.S.C. Section 823(g)(2)(G)(iii). |
---|
54 | 12 | | (b) Not later than November 1, 2019, the Health and Human |
---|
55 | 13 | | Services Commission shall amend the commission's Medicaid |
---|
56 | 14 | | Substance Use Disorder Services Medical Policy and any other |
---|
57 | 15 | | provider or claims payment policy or manual necessary to authorize |
---|
58 | 16 | | Medicaid medical benefits reimbursement for the prescribing of |
---|
59 | 17 | | buprenorphine for the treatment of an opioid use disorder by an |
---|
60 | 18 | | advanced practice registered nurse recognized by the Texas Board of |
---|
61 | 19 | | Nursing as a clinical nurse specialist, nurse anesthetist, or nurse |
---|
62 | 20 | | midwife, provided that the advanced practice registered nurse: |
---|
63 | 21 | | (1) is a qualifying practitioner; and |
---|
64 | 22 | | (2) has obtained a waiver from registration |
---|
65 | 23 | | requirements as provided by 21 U.S.C. Section 823(g). |
---|
66 | | - | SECTION 4. Section 481.0765, Health and Safety Code, as |
---|
67 | | - | amended by this Act, applies only to a prescription issued on or |
---|
68 | | - | after the effective date of this Act. A prescription issued before |
---|
69 | | - | the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on |
---|
70 | | - | the date the prescription is issued, and the former law is continued |
---|
71 | | - | in effect for that purpose. |
---|
72 | | - | SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
73 | | - | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
74 | | - | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
75 | | - | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
76 | | - | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
77 | | - | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
78 | | - | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
| 24 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
83 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
84 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
85 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1564 passed the Senate on |
---|
86 | | - | April 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
87 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2019, by the |
---|
88 | | - | following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
91 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1564 passed the House, with |
---|
92 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
93 | | - | Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
94 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
95 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
96 | | - | Approved: |
---|
97 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
98 | | - | Date |
---|
99 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
100 | | - | Governor |
---|