Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019