Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB16 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 16
1+By: Hancock, et al. S.B. No. 16
2+ (Stucky)
3+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 16: No.
24
35
6+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
47 AN ACT
58 relating to a student loan repayment assistance program for certain
69 full-time peace officers in this state.
710 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
811 SECTION 1. Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
912 Subchapter NN to read as follows:
1013 SUBCHAPTER NN. PEACE OFFICER LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE PROGRAM
1114 Sec. 61.9951. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "peace
1215 officer" has the meaning assigned by Article 2.12, Code of Criminal
1316 Procedure.
1417 Sec. 61.9952. LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE AUTHORIZED;
1518 PURPOSE. The board shall establish and administer a program to
1619 provide, in accordance with this subchapter and board rules, loan
1720 repayment assistance in the repayment of eligible loans for
1821 eligible persons who agree to continued employment as full-time
1922 peace officers in this state for a specified period.
2023 Sec. 61.9953. INITIAL ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible to
2124 receive loan repayment assistance under this subchapter for the
2225 first year for which the person seeks loan repayment assistance, a
2326 person must:
2427 (1) be initially employed as a peace officer on or
2528 after September 1, 2019;
2629 (2) submit to the board an initial application for the
2730 loan repayment assistance, in the manner and on a form prescribed by
2831 board rule, that requires:
2932 (A) employer verification of the person's
3033 employment as a full-time peace officer in this state for at least
3134 one year and the person's current employment as a peace officer in
3235 this state as of the date of the application;
3336 (B) a transcript of the person's postsecondary
3437 course work; and
3538 (C) a statement of the total amount of principal,
3639 accrued interest, fees, and other charges due on all outstanding
3740 eligible loans for which the person is applying for repayment
3841 assistance;
3942 (3) have earned at least 60 semester credit hours or
4043 the equivalent at an institution of higher education or a private or
4144 independent institution of higher education before the person's
4245 initial employment as a peace officer;
4346 (4) be currently employed, and have completed at least
4447 one year of employment, as a full-time peace officer in this state;
4548 and
4649 (5) comply with any other requirement adopted by the
4750 board under this subchapter.
4851 Sec. 61.9954. CONTINUING ELIGIBILITY. (a) Except as
4952 provided by Subsection (b), after initially qualifying for loan
5053 repayment assistance under Section 61.9953, a person may continue
5154 to receive loan repayment assistance in a subsequent year only if
5255 the person annually submits an application, in the manner and on a
5356 form prescribed by board rule, that requires employer verification
5457 of the person's continuous employment as a full-time peace officer
5558 in this state for the year ending immediately before the date the
5659 application is submitted under this section.
5760 (b) A person may not receive loan repayment assistance under
5861 this subchapter for more than five years.
5962 Sec. 61.9955. AWARD. (a) Except as provided by this
6063 section, an eligible person is entitled to receive an annual amount
6164 of loan repayment assistance payments under this subchapter payable
6265 to the holders of the eligible person's eligible loans for each year
6366 of eligibility approved by the board under Section 61.9953 or
6467 61.9954 in an amount equal to the lesser of $4,000 or 20 percent of
6568 the total amount stated in the person's application under Section
6669 61.9953, subject to the amount of available funding.
6770 (b) If at the time an eligible person submits an initial
6871 application under Section 61.9953 the payoff period for the
6972 person's total outstanding balance of eligible loans is less than
7073 five years, the board shall make annual payments under this
7174 subchapter to the holders of the person's eligible loans in the
7275 amounts of the payments and accrued interest due for the applicable
7376 year.
7477 (c) The total amount of repayment assistance provided under
7578 this subchapter to an eligible person may not exceed $20,000.
7679 (d) If in any year the amount of money available for loan
7780 repayment assistance under this subchapter is insufficient to
7881 provide loan repayment assistance to cover all the payments for the
7982 year for all eligible loans of all eligible persons, the board shall
8083 establish criteria to determine the amount of available money to
8184 allocate to the holders of student loans of eligible persons as the
8285 board determines appropriate to further the purpose of this
8386 subchapter.
8487 (e) An eligible person whose annual loan repayment
8588 assistance under this section is less than the amount necessary to
8689 cover the amount of principal and interest due on the person's
8790 eligible loans for that year is responsible for the payment of the
8891 remainder of the amount due and for otherwise preventing a default
8992 on the loan.
9093 Sec. 61.9956. ELIGIBLE LOANS. (a) The board may provide
9194 loan repayment assistance under this subchapter for the repayment
9295 of any student loan received by an eligible person through any
9396 lender for the cost of attendance at an institution of higher
9497 education or a private or independent institution of higher
9598 education for a semester or other term that ended in the five years
9699 immediately preceding the person's initial employment as a peace
97100 officer.
98101 (b) If the loan is not a state or federal guaranteed student
99102 loan, the promissory note or other loan agreement document
100103 governing the terms of the loan must require all the loan proceeds
101104 to be used for expenses incurred by a person in attending an
102105 institution of higher education or a private or independent
103106 institution of higher education.
104107 (c) The board may not provide loan repayment assistance
105108 under this subchapter for an eligible loan that is in default on the
106109 date the person's application for loan repayment assistance is
107110 submitted under Section 61.9953 or 61.9954.
108- Sec. 61.9957. PAYMENT OF LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE.
109- (a) The board shall pay any loan repayment assistance under this
111+ Sec. 61.9957. PAYMENT OF LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE. (a)
112+ The board shall pay any loan repayment assistance under this
110113 subchapter in a lump sum delivered on the eligible person's behalf
111114 directly to the holder of the loan.
112115 (b) Loan repayment assistance provided under this
113116 subchapter may be applied to any amount due on the loan.
114117 (c) Each state fiscal biennium, the board shall attempt to
115118 allocate all money available to the board for the purpose of
116119 providing loan repayment assistance under this subchapter.
117120 Sec. 61.9958. GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The board may
118121 solicit and accept gifts, grants, and other donations from any
119122 public or private source for the purposes of this subchapter.
120- Sec. 61.9959. RULES; POSTING REQUIRED. (a) The board
121- shall adopt rules necessary for the administration of this
122- subchapter.
123+ Sec. 61.9959. RULES; POSTING REQUIRED. (a) The board shall
124+ adopt rules necessary for the administration of this subchapter.
123125 (b) The board shall post on the board's Internet website a
124126 copy of the rules adopted under this subchapter and information
125127 regarding the program established under this subchapter.
126128 SECTION 2. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
127129 shall adopt rules for the peace officer loan repayment assistance
128130 program under Subchapter NN, Chapter 61, Education Code, as added
129131 by this Act, not later than December 1, 2019.
130132 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
131- ______________________________ ______________________________
132- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
133- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 16 passed the Senate on
134- April 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
135- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2019, by the
136- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
137- ______________________________
138- Secretary of the Senate
139- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 16 passed the House, with
140- amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132,
141- Nays 9, two present not voting.
142- ______________________________
143- Chief Clerk of the House
144- Approved:
145- ______________________________
146- Date
147- ______________________________
148- Governor