Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1613 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/06/2019

                            By: Hall S.B. No. 1613
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax; May 6, 2019,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1613 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to turnout requirements for certain elections authorizing
 the issuance of bonds or an increase in taxes by a political
 subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 2, Election Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2.  VOTE REQUIRED FOR ELECTION [TO OFFICE]
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 2, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. TURNOUT REQUIREMENTS
 Sec. 2.101.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter does not apply
 to an election held on the November uniform election date of an
 even-numbered year.
 Sec. 2.102.  POLITICAL SUBDIVISION BOND OR TAX ELECTION. An
 election held by a political subdivision to authorize the issuance
 of bonds or a tax increase has no effect regarding the issuance of
 the bonds or the tax increase unless more than 15 percent of the
 registered voters of the political subdivision in which the
 election is held whose registrations are effective on the date of
 the election vote in the election in which the bond or tax
 proposition is on the ballot.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 bonds authorized to be issued or a tax increase authorized on or
 after the effective date of this Act. Bonds or a tax increase
 authorized before the effective date of this Act are governed by the
 law in effect when the bonds were authorized, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *