Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019