House
|
05/19/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Seliger
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|