Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1712 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 86R12908 JTS-D
22 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1712
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation
88 and a regional mobility authority to enter into a comprehensive
99 development agreement for a project in Hidalgo and Cameron
1010 Counties.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is
1313 redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended
1414 to read as follows:
1515 Sec. 223.2001. DEFINITION. [(b)] In this subchapter,
1616 "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a
1717 minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction,
1818 rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in
1919 Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the
2020 financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project
2121 described in that section [Subsection (a)].
2222 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
2323 is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows:
2424 Sec. 223.2002. LIMITATION. The department may enter into a
2525 comprehensive development agreement only:
2626 (1) for specific projects authorized under this
2727 subchapter; or
2828 (2) as provided by Subchapter F.
2929 SECTION 3. Sections 223.201(f), (g), and (j),
3030 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
3131 (f) The department may enter into a comprehensive
3232 development agreement [only] for all or part of[:
3333 [(1)] the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project[;
3434 [(2) the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
3535 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
3636 Highway 380;
3737 [(3) the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
3838 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
3939 [(4) the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
4040 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
4141 Highway 35E;
4242 [(5) the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
4343 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
4444 [(A) Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
4545 Interstate Highway 20; and
4646 [(B) U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
4747 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
4848 [(6) the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway
4949 59 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
5050 [(7) the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
5151 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
5252 [(8) the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
5353 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
5454 [(9) the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
5555 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
5656 [(10) the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
5757 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
5858 [(11) the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
5959 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; and
6060 [(12) the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
6161 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
6262 Interstate Highway 37].
6363 (g) The department may combine in a comprehensive
6464 development agreement under this subchapter:
6565 (1) a toll project and a rail facility as defined by
6666 Section 91.001; or
6767 (2) two or more projects for which the department is
6868 authorized under this subchapter to enter into a comprehensive
6969 development agreement [described by Subsection (f)].
7070 (j) Before the department may enter into a comprehensive
7171 development agreement [under Subsection (f)], the department must:
7272 (1) for a project other than the State Highway 99
7373 (Grand Parkway) project, obtain[, not later than August 31, 2017,]
7474 the appropriate environmental clearance:
7575 (A) for the project; or
7676 (B) for the initial or base scope of the project
7777 if the project agreement provides for the phased construction of
7878 the project; and
7979 (2) present to the commission a full financial plan
8080 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals.
8181 SECTION 4. Section 223.2012(a), Transportation Code, is
8282 amended to read as follows:
8383 (a) In this section, the North Tarrant Express project is
8484 the project on Interstate Highway 35W in Tarrant County from
8585 Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114 that was [described by
8686 Section 223.201(f)(3)] entered into on June 23, 2009.
8787 SECTION 5. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
8888 is amended by adding Section 223.2014 to read as follows:
8989 Sec. 223.2014. AUTHORIZED PROJECTS; EXPIRATION. (a) The
9090 department may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for
9191 a project listed under Section 370.3051.
9292 (b) This section expires August 31, 2025.
9393 SECTION 6. Section 370.305, Transportation Code, is amended
9494 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f)
9595 to read as follows:
9696 (c) An authority may enter into a comprehensive development
9797 agreement only:
9898 (1) for specific projects authorized under this
9999 subchapter; or
100100 (2) as provided by Subchapter K [Except as provided by
101101 this chapter, an authority's authority to enter into a
102102 comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011].
103103 (d) Before an authority may enter into a comprehensive
104104 development agreement, the authority must:
105105 (1) obtain the appropriate environmental clearance:
106106 (A) for the project; or
107107 (B) for the initial or base scope of the project
108108 if the project agreement provides for the phased construction of
109109 the project; and
110110 (2) present to the commission a full financial plan
111111 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals.
112112 (e) In this section, "environmental clearance" means:
113113 (1) a finding of no significant impact has been issued
114114 for the project or, as applicable, for the initial or base scope of
115115 the project; or
116116 (2) for a project for which an environmental impact
117117 statement is prepared, a record of decision has been issued for that
118118 project or, as applicable, for the initial or base scope of the
119119 project.
120120 (f) The department may not provide any financial assistance
121121 to an authority to pay for the costs of procuring a comprehensive
122122 development agreement.
123123 SECTION 7. Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
124124 is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows:
125125 Sec. 370.3051. AUTHORIZED PROJECT FOR COMPREHENSIVE
126126 DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENT; EXPIRATION. (a) A regional mobility
127127 authority may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for
128128 the Farm-to-Market 1925 project from U.S. Highway 281 in Hidalgo
129129 County to U.S. Highway 77 in Cameron County.
130130 (b) This section expires August 31, 2025.
131131 SECTION 8. Section 228.104(a), Transportation Code, is
132132 amended to read as follows:
133133 (a) The principal of, interest on, and any redemption
134134 premium on bonds issued by the commission under this subchapter are
135135 payable solely from:
136136 (1) the revenue of the toll project or system for which
137137 the bonds are issued, including tolls pledged to pay the bonds;
138138 (2) the proceeds of bonds issued for the project or
139139 system;
140140 (3) the amounts deposited in a debt service reserve
141141 fund as required by the trust agreement securing bonds issued for
142142 the project or system;
143143 (4) amounts received under a credit agreement relating
144144 to the project or system for which the bonds are issued;
145145 (5) surplus revenue of another project or system as
146146 authorized by Section 228.006; and
147147 (6) amounts received by the department:
148148 (A) as pass-through tolls under Section 222.104;
149149 (B) under an agreement with a local governmental
150150 entity entered into under Section 228.254;
151151 (C) under other agreements with a local
152152 governmental entity relating to the project or system for which the
153153 bonds are issued; and
154154 (D) under a comprehensive development agreement
155155 entered into under Subchapter E, Chapter 223 [Section 223.201].
156156 SECTION 9. The following provisions of the Transportation
157157 Code are repealed:
158158 (1) Sections 223.201(i), (k), and (m); and
159159 (2) Section 223.2011.
160160 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.