Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1728 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Huffman, Lucio S.B. No. 1728
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
4+ April 4, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 4, 2019,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1728 By: Huffman
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to an interim study by the Texas Commission on Judicial
714 Selection regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate
815 judges are selected.
916 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1017 SECTION 1. COMMISSION; STUDY. (a) The Texas Commission on
1118 Judicial Selection is established to study and review the method by
1219 which the following judges and justices are selected for office in
1320 this state:
1421 (1) statutory county court judges, including probate
1522 court judges;
1623 (2) district judges; and
1724 (3) appellate justices and judges.
1825 (b) The study conducted under this section must consider:
1926 (1) the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
2027 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
2128 section through partisan elections;
2229 (2) the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
2330 judicial selection methods proposed or adopted by other states;
2431 (3) the relative merits of alternative methods for
2532 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
2633 section, including:
2734 (A) lifetime appointment;
2835 (B) appointment for a term;
2936 (C) appointment for a term, followed by a
3037 partisan election;
3138 (D) appointment for a term, followed by a
3239 nonpartisan election;
3340 (E) appointment for a term, followed by a
3441 nonpartisan retention election;
3542 (F) partisan election for an open seat, followed
3643 by a nonpartisan retention election for incumbents; and
3744 (G) any other method or combination of methods
3845 for selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of
3946 this section; and
4047 (4) the merits of using a public member board to
4148 nominate or assess the qualifications of candidates for judicial
4249 office.
4350 (c) The Texas Commission on Judicial Selection consists of
4451 15 members appointed as follows:
4552 (1) four members appointed by the governor;
46- (2) four members appointed by the lieutenant governor,
47- including three senators, with at least:
53+ (2) four senators appointed by the lieutenant
54+ governor, including:
4855 (A) one senator who is a member of the political
4956 party with which the lieutenant governor is affiliated; and
5057 (B) one senator who is a member of a political
5158 party other than the political party with which the lieutenant
5259 governor is affiliated;
53- (3) four members appointed by the speaker of the house
54- of representatives, including three members of the house of
55- representatives, with at least:
60+ (3) four members of the house of representatives
61+ appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives,
62+ including:
5663 (A) one representative who is a member of the
5764 political party with which the speaker of the house is affiliated;
5865 and
59- (B) one representative who is a member of a
66+ (B) one representatives who is a member of a
6067 political party other than the political party with which the
6168 speaker of the house is affiliated;
6269 (4) one member appointed by the chief justice of the
6370 Supreme Court of Texas;
6471 (5) one member appointed by the presiding judge of the
6572 Texas Court of Criminal Appeals; and
6673 (6) one member appointed by the board of directors of
6774 the State Bar of Texas.
6875 (d) The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
6976 house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the
7077 members appointed to the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection
7178 reflect, to the extent practicable, the racial, ethnic, and
7279 geographic diversity of this state and include individuals who are
7380 attorneys and individuals who are not attorneys.
7481 (e) The governor shall designate the presiding officer of
7582 the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection.
7683 (f) The Texas Commission on Judicial Selection shall
7784 convene at the call of the presiding officer.
7885 (g) A member of the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection
7986 is not entitled to compensation but is entitled to reimbursement
8087 for actual and necessary expenses incurred in serving as a member of
8188 the commission.
8289 (h) The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
8390 System shall provide necessary administrative support to the Texas
8491 Commission on Judicial Selection.
8592 (i) Not later than December 31, 2020, the Texas Commission
8693 on Judicial Selection shall submit to the governor and the
8794 legislature a report on the commission's findings and
8895 recommendations on a method or methods for selecting for office
8996 judges listed in Subsection (a) of this section that ensure a fair,
9097 impartial, qualified, competent, and stable judiciary. The
9198 commission shall include in its recommendations specific
9299 constitutional and statutory changes that appear necessary from the
93100 results of the commission's study.
94101 SECTION 2. ABOLITION OF COMMISSION. The Texas Commission
95102 on Judicial Selection is abolished and this Act expires January 2,
96103 2021.
97- SECTION 3. The Office of Court Administration of the Texas
98- Judicial System is required to implement a provision of this Act
99- only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
100- purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
101- specifically for that purpose, the Office of Court Administration
102- of the Texas Judicial System may, but is not required to, implement
103- a provision of this Act using other appropriations available for
104- that purpose.
105- SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
104+ SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
106105 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
107106 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
108107 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
109108 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
109+ * * * * *